Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luidj Škakoc (Scacoz), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1758BornTrogir (Tra¨)
8 Aug 181557.0AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
13 Aug 181557.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
13 Nov 183173.2ResignedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
2 Dec 183173.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
22 Feb 184283.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

MicroData Summary for Luidj Škakoc (Scacoz) (VIAF: 301843188)
Archbishop Luidj Škakoc (Scacoz) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1815, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145, and Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016