Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Belli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1753BornRoma, Italy
1 Jun 177623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
26 Sep 181461.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
2 Oct 181461.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
3 Mar 182268.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus

MicroData Summary for Michele Belli:
Archbishop Michele Belli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014