Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Mattei Baldini

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1780³BornPergola
28 Aug 180323.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181736.6AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
20 Apr 181736.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
27 Jan 184261.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
23 Oct 1843³63.1DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Mattei Baldini:
Archbishop Nicola Mattei Baldini (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 129, and Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014