Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Alberini

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1770Born
25 May 179322.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 181948.8AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
18 Apr 181948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
24 Nov 181949.4DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alberini
Bishop Francesco Alberini (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast