Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe d’Alessio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1859Born
23 Dec 188223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
25 Dec 191657.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
25 Dec 191657.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
25 Jan 191757.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
17 Aug 194586.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe d’Alessio
Bishop Giuseppe d’Alessio (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast