Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregor [Krikor] Govrighian [Govrik], C.A.M. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis per gli Armeni

Titular See: (C.M.Vd.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1840BornGherla
1861²20.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista
7 May 191070.0AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista
7 May 191070.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis per gli Armeni
8 Jun 191070.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nisibis per gli Armeni
24 Jan 193190.7DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregor [Krikor] Govrighian [Govrik]:
Archbishop Gregor [Krikor] Govrighian [Govrik] C.A.M. (born , died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1910, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013