Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Boetto, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1871BornVigone
30 Jul 190130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Dec 193564.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193564.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
17 Mar 193866.8AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Mar 193866.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
24 Apr 193866.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
31 Jan 194674.7DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Boetto:
Cardinal Pietro Boetto S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1938, Number 26
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013