Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Luca Ermenegildo Pasetto, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1871BornPadova
10 Aug 189624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Nov 192150.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
27 Nov 192150.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
20 Dec 193564.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
22 Sep 193766.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
11 Nov 195079.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
22 Jan 195482.3DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Luca Ermenegildo Pasetto:
Patriarch Luca Ermenegildo Pasetto O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1921, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015