Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Caputo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aversa, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1843Born
16 Mar 186723.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188339.3AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1 Apr 188339.4Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
7 Jun 188642.5AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Apr 189753.4ResignedBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Apr 189753.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
19 Apr 189753.4AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
14 Jan 190460.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
24 Aug 190763.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
27 Sep 190864.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Caputo (VIAF: 60008119)
Bishop Carlo Caputo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSte Madeleine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136, and Page 392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 11
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast