Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Grassi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1868Born
19 May 189426.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 193768.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamiathis
24 Feb 193768.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamiathis
14 Sep 195486.5DiedTitular Bishop of Tamiathis

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Grassi
Bishop Guglielmo Grassi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tamiathis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenzano

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast