Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Hittmair

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1859Born
29 Jul 188829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
17 Mar 190949.6SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
14 Apr 190949.7ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
1 May 190949.7Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
5 Mar 191555.6DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Hittmair
Bishop Rudolf Hittmair (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMattighofen

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast