Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Scarano

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1867BornTrivento
22 Mar 191749.4AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1 May 191749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
25 Dec 193164.2DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Scarano:
Bishop Luigi Scarano (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1917, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013