Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Izzi

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1873Born
13 Oct 189522.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 191542.3AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
23 Sep 191542.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
31 Dec 191744.8DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Izzi
Bishop Michele Izzi (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerignola

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast