Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Attilio Adinolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1885Born
31 Aug 190822.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 192842.2AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
11 Mar 192842.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
5 May 193145.4AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
1 Sep 194559.8DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Attilio Adinolfi
Bishop Attilio Adinolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbano, Suburbicarian See of Albano

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast