Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Connolly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baker, Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1922Born
8 Apr 194724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Reno, Nevada, USA
4 May 197148.7AppointedBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
30 Jun 197148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
19 Nov 199977.3RetiredBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
24 Apr 201592.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Baker, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Connolly
Bishop Thomas Joseph Connolly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baker

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTonopah

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Oct 2017