Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Michael De Falco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1915Born
11 Jun 194226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
16 Apr 196347.6AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
30 May 196347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
13 Jun 196347.8InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
28 Aug 197964.0ResignedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
22 Sep 197964.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Amarillo, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Michael De Falco
Bishop Lawrence Michael De Falco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amarillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMcKeesport, PA

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Aug 2018

Quantcast