Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ambrose Tschoepe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1915Born
30 May 194327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
12 Jan 196650.0AppointedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
9 Mar 196650.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
27 Aug 196953.6AppointedBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
29 Oct 196953.8InstalledBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
14 Jul 199074.5RetiredBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
24 Jan 200993.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ambrose Tschoepe
Bishop Thomas Ambrose Tschoepe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dallas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePilot Point
Ordained PriestWorthington, OH

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast