Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Eugene Cardinal George, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1937Born
21 Dec 196326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 Jul 199053.4AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
21 Sep 199053.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
30 Apr 199659.2AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
27 May 199659.3InstalledArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
7 Apr 199760.2AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 May 199760.3InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
21 Feb 199861.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199861.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
20 Sep 201477.6RetiredArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
17 Apr 201578.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Eugene George (VIAF: 49022419)
Francis Eugene Cardinal George O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestSt. Pascal, Church, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopCathedral, Yakima, Diocese of Yakima, Washington
Death PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Buried Place (Original)All Saints, Cemetery, Des Plaines, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,079
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Oct 2020

Quantcast