Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Rojas

Coadjutor Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1965 Born
24 May 199732.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
13 Jun 201146.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
13 Jun 201146.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
10 Aug 201146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
2 Dec 201954.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Alberto Rojas
Bishop Alberto Rojas (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of San Bernardino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Zapote de la Labor, MÚxico
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Bernardino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,126
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast