Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Michael Birmingham

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Dolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1971 Born
24 May 199725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Sep 202048.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Sep 202048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dolia
13 Nov 202049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dolia

MicroData Summary for Kevin Michael Birmingham
Bishop Kevin Michael Birmingham (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOak Lawn, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Sep 2020
  • c34: CB, 5 Oct 2020
  • mn: CB, 19 Oct 2020
  • bd: CB, 28 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast