Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gustavo Garcia-Siller, M.Sp.S.

Archbishop of San Antonio, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1956 BornSan Luis Potosí, México
197518.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
22 Jun 198427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Holy Spirit
24 Jan 200346.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 200346.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
19 Mar 200346.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
14 Oct 201053.8AppointedArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
23 Nov 201053.9InstalledArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Garcia-Siller:
Archbishop Gustavo Garcia-Siller M.Sp.S. (born ) Archbishop of San Antonio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Antonio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 30 Jan 2014