Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger Lawrence Schwietz, O.M.I.

Archbishop Emeritus of Anchorage, Alaska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1940 BornSaint Paul, MN
20 Dec 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
12 Dec 198949.4AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
2 Feb 199049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
18 Jan 200059.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
24 Mar 200059.7InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
3 Mar 200160.6SucceededArchbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
16 Jan 200867.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Juneau, Alaska, USA
19 Jan 200968.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Juneau, Alaska, USA
20 Sep 201373.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
15 Dec 201474.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
4 Oct 201676.2RetiredArchbishop of Anchorage, Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger Lawrence Schwietz
Archbishop Roger Lawrence Schwietz O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Anchorage

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Anchorage.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,690
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Oct 2016