Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Genn

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1950 BornBurgbrohl
11 Jul 197626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
16 Apr 199949.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
16 Apr 199949.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
30 May 199949.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
4 Apr 200353.1AppointedBishop of Essen, Germany
6 Jul 200353.3InstalledBishop of Essen, Germany
19 Dec 200858.8AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
29 Mar 200959.1InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Felix Genn:
Bishop Felix Genn (born ) Bishop of Münster

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,567
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014