Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludger Schepers

Auxiliary Bishop of Essen

Titular Bishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1953 BornOberhausen
2 Mar 197925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
27 Jun 200855.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
27 Jun 200855.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
19 Sep 200855.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari

MicroData Summary for Ludger Schepers:
Bishop Ludger Schepers (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Essen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Essen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jun 2014