Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Hegge

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sicilibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1962 Born
10 Oct 198826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
31 May 201047.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
31 May 201047.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
29 Aug 201048.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba

MicroData Summary for Christoph Hegge (VIAF: 71571802)
Bishop Christoph Hegge (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRheine
Ordained BishopCathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,778

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast