Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Stein

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1904BornWeiler
27 Oct 192925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
2 Sep 194440.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
2 Sep 194440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dagnum
5 Nov 194440.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dagnum
13 Apr 196762.6SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
25 Apr 196762.6ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
5 Jun 196762.8InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany
5 Sep 198076.0RetiredBishop of Trier, Germany
20 Feb 199388.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Stein:
Bishop Bernhard Stein (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trier

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013