Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieter Geerlings

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tacapae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1947 Born
20 May 197325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
31 May 201062.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
31 May 201062.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
29 Aug 201063.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacapae
24 Nov 201770.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dieter Geerlings
Bishop Dieter Geerlings (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmmerich
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,777
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018