Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilfried Theising

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Mina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1962 Born
14 May 198926.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
31 May 201047.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
31 May 201047.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
29 Aug 201047.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina

MicroData Summary for Wilfried Theising
Bishop Wilfried Theising (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWettringen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,779
  • c1: MW, 25 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017