Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard Lettmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1933BornDatteln
21 Feb 195925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197339.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197339.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
24 Feb 197339.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria
11 Jan 198046.8AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Mar 198047.0InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany
28 Mar 200875.0RetiredBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Apr 201380.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Reinhard Lettmann:
Bishop Reinhard Lettmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2008
  • d: CB, 16 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 27 Jan 2015