Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Tenhumberg

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1915BornLünten
23 Sep 193924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
28 May 195842.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
28 May 195842.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
20 Jul 195843.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
7 Jul 196954.0AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
14 Sep 196954.2InstalledBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Sep 197964.2DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Tenhumberg:
Bishop Heinrich Tenhumberg (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 27 Jan 2015