Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Ackermann

Bishop of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1963 BornMayen
10 Oct 198724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
14 Mar 200642.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
14 Mar 200642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
14 May 200643.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
8 Apr 200946.0AppointedBishop of Trier, Germany
24 May 200946.1InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan Ackermann:
Bishop Stephan Ackermann (born ) Bishop of Trier

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,155
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015