Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rolf Lohmann

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Gor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1963 Born
14 May 198926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
25 Apr 201754.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
25 Apr 201754.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
8 Jul 201754.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor

MicroData Summary for Rolf Lohmann
Bishop Rolf Lohmann (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamm, Archdiocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopSt. Paul’s, Cathedral, Münster, Diocese of Münster

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2017
  • c1: MW, 25 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017