Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Josef Spital

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1925BornMünster
6 Aug 195226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
15 Oct 198054.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Oct 198054.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
14 Dec 198055.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
24 Feb 198155.1AppointedBishop of Trier, Germany
17 May 198155.4InstalledBishop of Trier, Germany
15 Jan 200175.0RetiredBishop of Trier, Germany
10 Jan 200781.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Josef Spital:
Bishop Hermann Josef Spital (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trier

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013