Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Josef Cardinal Frings

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1887BornNeuss
10 Aug 191023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 May 194255.2AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Jun 194255.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Feb 194659.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194659.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
24 Feb 196982.0RetiredArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Dec 197891.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Frings:
Josef Cardinal Frings (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
  • a cardinal for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015