Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Orsenigo

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1873Born
5 Jul 189622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
23 Jun 192248.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya
24 Jun 192248.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands
25 Jun 192248.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya
2 Jun 192551.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
14 Feb 193056.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
18 Feb 193056.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Prussia
31 May 193460.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Prussia
1 Apr 194672.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Germany

MicroData Summary for Cesare Orsenigo
(VIAF: 804504; WikiData: Q649793)
Archbishop Cesare Orsenigo (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Germany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla San Carlo, Valgreghentino, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestMonza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Olginate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 39
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 133, and Page 134, and Page 188
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 219, and Page 255
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 217, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 452, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 491, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 541, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 625, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 745, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,077, Ascendance
  • opd: CB, 13 Sep 2023
  • loc: AM, 8 Feb 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 9 Feb 2024