Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Jacek Zimniak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

Titular Bishop of Dionysiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1878BornNieklan Maly
24 Sep 190527.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 193658.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
14 Aug 193658.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
18 Oct 193658.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
26 Jan 194365.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Jacek Zimniak:
Bishop Antoni Jacek Zimniak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013