Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Władysław Ziółek

Archbishop Emeritus of Łódź


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1935 BornKomorniki
13 Jul 195823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
12 Mar 198044.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
12 Mar 198044.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
4 May 198044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
24 Jan 198650.6AppointedBishop of Łódź, Poland
25 Mar 199256.8AppointedArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
11 Jul 201277.1RetiredArchbishop of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Władysław Ziółek: VIAF:101764152
Archbishop Władysław Ziółek (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Łódź

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Łódź.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 May 2014