Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teofil Bromboszcz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

Titular Bishop of Candyba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1886BornLigota
23 Mar 191225.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Katowice, Poland
26 Jun 191226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
24 Mar 193447.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
24 Mar 193447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Candyba
3 Jun 193448.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Candyba
12 Jan 193750.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teofil Bromboszcz:
Bishop Teofil Bromboszcz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013