Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Adamski

Deceased

Bishop of Katowice, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1875Born
12 Nov 189924.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 193055.3AppointedBishop of Katowice, Poland
26 Oct 193055.5Ordained BishopBishop of Katowice, Poland
12 Nov 196792.5DiedBishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Adamski (VIAF: 47564556)
Bishop Stanislaw Adamski (born , died ) Bishop of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZielona Góra

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast