Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célestine René Laurent Guynemer de la Hailandière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vincennes, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1798BornTriandin, France
28 May 182527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes, France
17 May 183941.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
17 May 183941.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
26 Jun 183941.1SucceededBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
18 Aug 183941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
7 Feb 184748.8ResignedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
1 May 188284.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vincennes, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Célestine René Laurent Guynemer de la Hailandière:
Bishop Célestine René Laurent Guynemer de la Hailandière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vincennes

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013