Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Charles-Richard Dancel

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1760BornCherbourg
2 Jun 182766.8SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
17 Sep 182767.1ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
28 Oct 182767.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
20 Apr 183675.7DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles-Richard Dancel:
Bishop Jean-Charles-Richard Dancel (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013