Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jean-Julien Robiou de la Tréhonnais

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1784BornCombourg
11 Jun 180824.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 183551.8SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
1 Feb 183652.1ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
6 Mar 183652.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
7 Dec 185268.9ResignedBishop of Coutances, France
20 Nov 187086.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jean-Julien Robiou de la Tréhonnais:
Bishop Louis-Jean-Julien Robiou de la Tréhonnais (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coutances

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013