Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mellon de Jolly

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1795BornSézanne
18 Dec 181924.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 183641.0SelectedBishop of Sées, France
11 Jul 183641.1ConfirmedBishop of Sées, France
21 Aug 183641.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sées, France
8 Sep 183641.3InstalledBishop of Sées, France
23 Nov 184348.5SelectedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
25 Jan 184448.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
18 Mar 186771.8ResignedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
22 Apr 187276.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Mellon de Jolly:
Archbishop Mellon de Jolly (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 329, and Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013