Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Joseph de Villeneuve-Esclapon

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1757BornGrasse
13 Dec 182669.5SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
9 Apr 182769.8ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
20 May 182769.9Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
14 Nov 183174.4DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph de Villeneuve-Esclapon:
Bishop François-Joseph de Villeneuve-Esclapon (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013