Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François-Marcellin Turinaz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarentaise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1786BornLe Châtelard
7 Apr 181024.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 183751.6SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
12 Feb 183851.8ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
6 May 183852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
6 Sep 186680.4RetiredBishop of Tarentaise, France
28 Oct 186983.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarentaise, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Marcellin Turinaz:
Bishop Jean-François-Marcellin Turinaz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarentaise

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013