Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Marie Paul Petit

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

Titular Bishop of Voncaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1888BornCheppes-la-Prairie
6 Apr 191223.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 194253.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verdun, France
20 Jun 194253.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
1 Oct 194254.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
7 Jan 194657.4SucceededBishop of Verdun, France
31 Aug 196375.0RetiredBishop of Verdun, France
31 Aug 196375.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
13 Jan 197081.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Marie Paul Petit:
Bishop Georges Marie Paul Petit (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013