Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Roeder

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1880BornLa Rochette, Luxembourg
2 Jul 190726.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 193756.8AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
20 Oct 193757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
21 Feb 195574.3RetiredBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
21 Feb 195574.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
24 Feb 196584.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Félix Roeder:
Bishop Félix Roeder (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013