Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Miguel 聲gel Castro Mu隳z

Bishop-Elect of Huajuapan de Le鏮, Oaxaca, M憖ico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1970 Born
19 Oct 199726.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Puebla de los 聲geles, Puebla, M憖ico
29 Jun 199827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los 聲geles, Puebla, M憖ico
27 Mar 202150.3AppointedBishop of Huajuapan de Le鏮, Oaxaca, M憖ico
17 Jun 202150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Huajuapan de Le鏮, Oaxaca, M憖ico

MicroData Summary for Miguel 聲gel Castro Mu隳z
Father Miguel 聲gel Castro Mu隳z (born ) Bishop-Elect of Huajuapan de Le鏮

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles, Puebla
Ordained DeaconCathedral Basilica, Puebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles, Puebla
Ordained PriestCathedral Basilica, Puebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los 聲geles, Puebla

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Huajuapan de Le鏮.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2021
  • od/loc: CB, 27 Mar 2021
  • ob: AM, 19 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Apr 2021

Quantcast