Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Martín Barraza Beltrán, Ist. del Prado

Bishop-Elect of Torreón, Coahuila, México

Priest of Istituto del Prado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1963 Born
21 Apr 198824.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chihuahua, México
17 Jun 198824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chihuahua, México
1995²31.1EnteredPriest of Istituto del Prado
9 Sep 201753.7AppointedBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México
29 Nov 201754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Torreón, Coahuila, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Martín Barraza Beltrán
Father Luis Martín Barraza Beltrán Ist. del Prado (born ) Bishop-Elect of Torreón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Camargo, Archdiocese of Chihuahua
Ordained DeaconChihuahhua, Archdiocese of Chihuahua

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Torreón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2017
  • qidp/od: CB, 9 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Oct 2017