Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Enrique Samaniego López

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Cillium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1973 Born
4 Jan 200127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tlalnepantla, México, México
16 Feb 201945.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
16 Feb 201945.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cillium
25 Mar 201945.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cillium

MicroData Summary for Carlos Enrique Samaniego López
Bishop Carlos Enrique Samaniego López (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast